+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA VV; HJ 26, PG.761
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 13 (Vote 19-1; CC); HC 22, PG.508
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Executive Session: 3/5/2013 1:00 PM LOB 307
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Full Committee Work Session: 2/28/2013 10:00 AM LOB 307
- Subcommittee Work Session: 2/26/2013 2:15 PM LOB 307
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 2/19/2013 3:30 PM LOB 307
On January 16, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 1/29/2013 1:40 PM LOB 307
On January 3, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services; HJ 12, PG.183
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor