+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA VV
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Feb 19 (Vote 19-0; CC); HC 11
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Executive Session: 2/11/2014 10:00 AM LOB 301
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 2/4/2014 10:00 AM LOB 301
On December 13, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Municipal and County Government
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor