+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (25)
On August 7, 2024 in the House:
- Signed by Governor Sununu 08/02/2024; Chapter 331; eff. 01/01/2025 HJ 16
On July 23, 2024 in the House:
- Enrolled (in recess of) 06/13/2024 HJ 16 P. 56
On July 18, 2024 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Adopted, VV, (In recess 06/13/2024); SJ 18
On June 13, 2024 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report 2024-2242c: Adopted, VV 06/13/2024 HJ 16 P. 25
On June 13, 2024 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report # 2024-2242c, Adopted, VV; 06/13/2024; SJ 17
On June 6, 2024 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report Filed, # 2024-2242c; 06/13/2024
On June 4, 2024 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting: 06/04/2024 02:30 pm LOB 302-304
On May 30, 2024 in the Senate:
- Sen. Gannon Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, MA, VV; 05/30/2024; SJ 16
- President Appoints: Senators Gannon, Innis, Soucy; 05/30/2024; SJ 16
On May 29, 2024 in the House:
- House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 2024-2164s and Requests CofC (Reps. Hunt, Burroughs, Ammon, Grassie): MA VV 05/29/2024 HJ 14 P. 179
On May 23, 2024 in the Senate:
- Sen. Bradley Floor Amendment # 2024-2164s, AA, VV; 05/23/2024; SJ 15
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-2164s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; 05/23/2024; SJ 15
On May 22, 2024 in the Senate:
- Sen. Bradley Moved to Remove HB 1259 from the Consent Calendar; 05/22/2024; SJ 14
- Special Order to the end of the calendar on 05/23/2024, Without Objection, MA; 05/22/2024; SJ 14
On May 15, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/22/2024; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 20
On April 17, 2024 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 04/23/2024, Room 100, SH, 10:50 am; SC 16
On April 2, 2024 in the Senate:
- Introduced 03/21/2024 and Referred to Commerce; SJ 8
On March 28, 2024 in the House:
- Amendment # 2024-0762h: AA VV 03/28/2024 HJ 10 P. 11
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-0762h: MA VV 03/28/2024 HJ 10 P. 11
On March 18, 2024 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0762h 03/13/2024 (Vote 18-0; CC) HC 12 P. 6
On March 7, 2024 in the House:
- Executive Session: 03/13/2024 10:00 am LOB 302-304
On February 14, 2024 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 02/20/2024 10:00 am LOB 305
On February 7, 2024 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 02/14/2024 10:00 am LOB 302-304
On January 31, 2024 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 02/07/2024 10:30 am LOB 302-304
On December 1, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor