+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On July 30, 2024 in the House:
- Signed by Governor Sununu 07/26/2024; Chapter 265; eff. I. Sec 1-4 eff 1/1/25 II. Rem eff 7/26/24
On July 15, 2024 in the House:
- Enrolled (in recess of) 06/13/2024 HJ 16 P. 51
On July 11, 2024 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Adopted, VV, (In recess 06/13/2024); SJ 18
On May 31, 2024 in the House:
- House Concurs with Senate Amendment 2024-2104s (Rep. Lynn): MA DV 182-175 05/30/2024 HJ 15 P. 21
On May 23, 2024 in the Senate:
- Special Order to the last one in Judiciary, Without Objection, MA; 05/23/2024; SJ 15
- Sen. Birdsell Floor Amendment # 2024-2104s, AA, VV; 05/23/2024; SJ 15
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-2104s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; 05/23/2024; SJ 15
On May 22, 2024 in the Senate:
- Sen. Birdsell Moved to Remove HB 1245 from the Consent Calendar; 05/22/2024; SJ 14
- Special Order to the end of the calendar on 05/23/2024, Without Objection, MA; 05/22/2024; SJ 14
On May 15, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/22/2024; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 20
On April 24, 2024 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 04/30/2024, Room 100, SH, 02:15 pm; SC 17
On February 26, 2024 in the Senate:
- Introduced 02/21/2024 and Referred to Judiciary; SJ 6
On February 8, 2024 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA VV 02/08/2024 HJ 4 P. 10
On February 1, 2024 in the House:
- Executive Session: 01/31/2024 11:15 am LOB 206-208
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass 01/31/2024 (Vote 15-0; CC)
On January 17, 2024 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/31/2024 11:15 am LOB 206-208
On December 1, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Judiciary
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor