+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On June 27, 2024 in the House:
- Signed by Governor Sununu 06/26/2024; Chapter 95; eff. I. Sec 2 eff 7/1/24 II. Sec 3 eff 9/15/25 III. Sec 4-5 eff 7/1/24 IV. Rem eff 6/26/24 HJ 16
On June 18, 2024 in the House:
- Enrolled (in recess of) 06/13/2024 HJ 16 P. 43
On June 13, 2024 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report 2024-2240c: Adopted, VV 06/13/2024 HJ 16 P. 24
On June 12, 2024 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report # 2024-2240c, Adopted, VV; 06/13/2024; SJ 17
- Enrolled Adopted, VV, (In recess 06/13/2024); SJ 18
On June 6, 2024 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report Filed, # 2024-2240c; 06/13/2024
On June 4, 2024 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting: 06/04/2024 10:00 am LOB 302-304
On May 30, 2024 in the House:
- House Concurs with Senate Amendment 2024-1996s 2024-2174s and 2024-2079s (Rep. Hunt): MF DV 175-194 05/30/2024 HJ 15 P. 4
- House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 2024-1996s 2024-2174s and 2024-2079s and Requests CofC (Rep. Weber): MA VV 05/30/2024 HJ 15 P. 4
- Speaker Appoints: Reps. Hunt, Ammon, Burroughs, Beaulieu 05/30/2024 HJ 15 P. 4
On May 30, 2024 in the Senate:
- Sen. Birdsell Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, MA, VV; 05/30/2024; SJ 16
- President Appoints: Senators Bradley, Birdsell, Prentiss; 05/30/2024; SJ 16
On May 23, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment # 2024-1996s, AA, VV; 05/23/2024; SJ 15
- Sen. Bradley Floor Amendment # 2024-2174s, AA, VV; 05/23/2024; SJ 15
- Sen. Bradley Floor Amendment # 2024-2079s, AA, VV; 05/23/2024; SJ 15
- Ought to Pass with Amendments 2024-1996s, 2024-2174s, and 2024-2079s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; 05/23/2024; SJ 15
- Without Objection, the Clerk is authorized to make technical and administrative corrections which are necessary to reflect the intent of the Senate, MA; 05/23/2024; SJ 15
On May 22, 2024 in the Senate:
- Sen. Birdsell Moved to Remove HB 1236 from the Consent Calendar; 05/22/2024; SJ 14
- Special Order to the end of the calendar on 05/23/2024, Without Objection, MA; 05/22/2024; SJ 14
On May 16, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-1996s, 05/22/2024; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 20
On May 8, 2024 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 05/15/2024, Room 101, LOB, 09:00 am; SC 19
- Hearing: 05/15/2024, Room 101, LOB, 09:15 am, on proposed non-germane amendment # 2024-1745s; SC 19
On April 2, 2024 in the Senate:
- Introduced 03/21/2024 and Referred to Health and Human Services; SJ 8
On March 28, 2024 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA VV 03/28/2024 HJ 10 P. 7
On March 20, 2024 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass 03/13/2024 (Vote 18-0; CC) HC 12 P. 6
On March 7, 2024 in the House:
- Executive Session: 03/13/2024 10:00 am LOB 302-304
On February 7, 2024 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 02/14/2024 10:00 am LOB 302-304
On January 9, 2024 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/18/2024 10:00 am LOB 302-304
On December 1, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor