+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 15, 2024 in the Senate:
- Special Order to Beginning of Calendar, Without Objection, MA; 05/15/2024; SJ 12
- Special Order to Present Time, Without Objection, MA; 05/15/2024; SJ 12
- Refer to Interim Study, MA, VV; 05/15/2024; SJ 12
On May 1, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 05/15/2024, Vote 3-2; SC 19
On April 11, 2024 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 04/18/2024, Room 101, LOB, 01:30 pm; SC 15
On March 26, 2024 in the Senate:
- Introduced 03/21/2024 and Referred to Health and Human Services; SJ 8
On March 14, 2024 in the House:
- Amendment # 2024-0887h: AA VV 03/14/2024 HJ 8 P. 74
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-0887h: MA RC 294-66 03/14/2024 HJ 8 P. 75
On March 5, 2024 in the House:
- Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0887h 02/21/2024 (Vote 15-4; RC)
- Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
On February 15, 2024 in the House:
- Executive Session: 02/21/2024 11:00 am LOB 203
On January 5, 2024 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/18/2024 02:00 pm LOB 210-211
On December 1, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs