+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA RC 181-146 03/06/2018 HJ 6 P. 102
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0455h (NT)
- Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/06/2018 (Vote 12-9; RC) HC 9 P. 46
- Executive Session: 02/13/2018 LOB 304
On January 3, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/24/2018 01:30 PM LOB 304
On November 7, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy HJ 1 P. 3
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
March 6, 2018: ITL
- Yeas: 181
- Nays: 146
- Present/NV: 30
- Absent: 35