+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA VV 03/06/2018 HJ 6 P. 30
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/06/2018 (Vote 20-0; CC) HC 9 P. 15
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Executive Session: 02/13/2018 11:00 AM LOB 308
On January 3, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/11/2018 10:30 AM LOB 308
On November 7, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Election Law HJ 1 P. 3