+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 28, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor on 5/27/2014; Chapter 0079; Effective 7/26/2014
On May 5, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled (In recess of 4/30/14)
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On April 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg; SJ 10
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 4/24/14; Vote 5-0; CC; SC15
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 4/3/14, Room 101, LOB, 2:30 p.m.; SC12
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to Commerce
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA VV
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
- Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Feb 19 (Vote 12-6; RC); HC 11
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- Executive Session: 1/30/2014 2:00 PM LOB 302
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- Work Session: 1/28/2014 2:15 PM LOB 302
On January 9, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 1/21/2014 10:30 AM LOB 302
On December 13, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs