+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA Div 268-57
On February 21, 2014 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 12-0; RC); HC 14
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Executive Session: 2/12/2014 12:00 PM or at session lunch break LOB 104
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- Full Committee Work Session: 1/30/2014 2:30 PM LOB 104
On January 14, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 1/23/2014 2:00 PM LOB 104
On January 9, 2014 in the House:
- ===CANCELLED=== Public Hearing: 1/14/2014 10:00 AM LOB 104
On January 8, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 1/14/2014 10:00 AM LOB 104
On December 13, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Legislative Administration