+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA VV 02/11/2016 HJ 17 P. 36
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs HJ 4 P. 6
On February 5, 2016 in the House:
- Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass HC 7 P. 17
- Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/10/2016 (Vote 14-5; RC) HC 7 P. 17
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- Full Committee Work Session: 01/28/2016 10:00 AM LOB 302
- Subcommittee Work Session: 01/26/2016 01:00 PM LOB 302
On January 19, 2016 in the House:
- Executive Session: 02/02/2016 01:15 PM LOB302
On January 11, 2016 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/21/2016 11:00 AM LOB302
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor