+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Inexpedient to Legislate, MA, VV === BILL KILLED ===; 04/26/2018; SJ 14
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 04/26/2018; SC 18
On April 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 04/17/2018, Room 100, SH, 02:15 pm; SC 16
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced 03/21/2018 and Referred to Commerce; SJ 10
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 0274h: MA RC 192-139 03/15/2018 HJ 8 P. 19
- Minority Amendment # 2018-0274h (Rep. White): AA DV 201-120 03/15/2018 HJ 8 P. 19
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MF DV 159-162 03/15/2018 HJ 8 P. 18
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Special Order to 3/15/2018 Without Objection HJ 7 P. 49
- Suspend House Rule 65 (Reps. Hinch, Shurtleff): MA VV by necessary two-thirds vote 03/06/2018 HJ 6 P. 125
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0274h
- Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/06/2018 (Vote 12-9; RC) HC 9 P. 60
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Executive Session: 02/21/2018 11:00 AM LOB 307
On January 3, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/10/2018 10:00 AM LOB 307
On November 7, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services HJ 1 P. 3
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
March 15, 2018: OTPA
- Yeas: 192
- Nays: 139
- Present/NV: 14
- Absent: 47
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor