+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Inexpedient to Legislate, MA, VV === BILL KILLED ===; 05/15/2019; SJ 16
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; Vote 5-0; CC; 05/15/2019; SC 22
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 04/24/2019, Room 101, LOB, 09:45 am; SC 19
On April 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced 04/11/2019 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; SJ 13
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-1034h (NT): MA RC 218-155 04/04/2019 HJ 12 P. 20
- Amendment # 2019-1034h (NT): AA VV 04/04/2019 HJ 12 P. 20
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
- Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1034h (NT) for 04/04/2019 (Vote 13-9; RC) HC 18
On March 22, 2019 in the House:
- Executive Session: 03/27/2019 10:00 am LOB 210-211
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Finance Division I Work Session: 03/22/2019 10:30 am LOB 212
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Finance Division I Work Session: 03/13/2019 01:30 pm LOB 212
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Finance-Division I Work Session: 02/12/2019 10:00 am LOB 212
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Finance 01/31/2019 HJ 4 P. 21
- Ought to Pass: MA RC 255-115 01/31/2019 HJ 4 P. 19
- Removed from Consent (Rep. Yokela) 01/31/2019 HJ 4 P. 2
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 01/31/2019 (Vote 16-2; CC) HC 9 P. 4
On January 9, 2019 in the House:
- Executive Session: 01/17/2019 01:30 pm LOB 306
- Public Hearing: 01/17/2019 11:00 am LOB 306
On December 26, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration HJ 2 P. 38
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor