+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA VV 03/09/2016 HJ 23 P. 33
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/09/2016 (Vote 11-2; CC) HC 14 P. 20
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Executive Session: 02/18/2016 10:00 AM LOB 307
- Introduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Fish and Game and Marine Resources HJ 4 P. 5
On January 13, 2016 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/28/2016 12:00 PM LOB307