+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA VV 02/11/2016 HJ 17 P. 47
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Removed from Consent (Rep. Cushing) 02/10/2016 HJ 16 P. 2
- Introduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Education HJ 4 P. 5
On February 5, 2016 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/10/2016 (Vote 17-2; CC) HC 7 P. 3
On January 13, 2016 in the House:
- Executive Session: 01/26/2016 10:30 AM LOB207
- Public Hearing: 01/19/2016 10:30 AM LOB207
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor