+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On October 31, 2024 in the House:
- Interim Study Report: Recommended for Future Legislation (Vote 7-6)
On September 25, 2024 in the House:
- Executive Session: 10/15/2024 01:00 pm LOB 301-303
On June 4, 2024 in the House:
- Full Committee Work Session: 06/10/2024 11:00 am LOB 301-303
On March 7, 2024 in the House:
- Refer for Interim Study: MA VV 03/07/2024 HJ 7 P. 10
On February 27, 2024 in the House:
- Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study 02/20/2024 (Vote 18-0; CC) HC 9 P. 7
On February 14, 2024 in the House:
- Executive Session: 02/20/2024 10:00 am LOB 301-303
On February 6, 2024 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 02/13/2024 02:00 pm LOB 210-211
- Full Committee Work Session: 02/14/2024 03:30 pm LOB 301-303
On November 28, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Environment and Agriculture