+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On July 22, 2024 in the House:
- Signed by Governor Sununu 07/03/2024; Chapter 117; eff. 09/01/2024
On June 25, 2024 in the House:
- Enrolled (in recess of) 06/13/2024 HJ 16 P. 45
On June 24, 2024 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Adopted, VV, (In recess 06/13/2024); SJ 18
On May 22, 2024 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg; 05/22/2024; SJ 14
On May 16, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/22/2024; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 20
On March 20, 2024 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 03/28/2024, Room 100, SH, 01:45 pm; SC 12
On March 13, 2024 in the Senate:
- Introduced 03/07/2024 and Referred to Judiciary; SJ 7
On March 7, 2024 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA VV 03/07/2024 HJ 7 P. 17
On February 28, 2024 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass 02/15/2024 (Vote 17-2; CC) HC 9 P. 10
On February 6, 2024 in the House:
- Executive Session: 02/15/2024 10:00 am LOB 206-208
On January 17, 2024 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/31/2024 09:45 am LOB 206-208
On November 28, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Judiciary