+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On May 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Refer to Interim Study, MA, VV; SJ 13
On May 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 5/15/14; Vote 5-0; CC; SC18
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 4/9/14, Room 101, LOB, 9:00 a.m.; SC13
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA VV
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 17-0; CC); HC 14
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- Executive Session: 2/04/2014 10:00 AM LOB 303
On January 8, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 1/14/2014 10:00 AM LOB 303
On December 12, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Environment and Agriculture