+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA VV 03/09/2016 HJ 23 P. 4
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/09/2016 (Vote 20-0; CC) HC 14 P. 3
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Executive Session: 03/01/2016 01:15 PM LOB 302
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 02/18/2016 01:15 PM LOB 303
- Introduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs HJ 4 P. 4
On January 19, 2016 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/28/2016 03:00 PM LOB302
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor