+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On October 31, 2014 in the House:
- Interim Study Report: Recommended For Future Legislation (Vote 9-6)
On October 1, 2014 in the House:
- Executive Session: 10/21/2014 11:00 AM LOB 306
On August 15, 2014 in the House:
- Interim Study - Subcommittee Work Session: 8/26/2014 10:30 AM LOB 306
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Refer to Interim Study MA VV
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
- Majority Committee Report: Refer to Interim Study for Feb 12 (Vote 14-6; RC); HC 9
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- Executive Session: 2/04/2014 1:30 PM LOB 306=CONTINUED=
On January 16, 2014 in the House:
- Executive Session: 1/21/2014 1:30 PM LOB 306=Recessed=
On January 8, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 1/14/2014 10:00 AM LOB 306
On December 12, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor