+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 15, 2024 in the Senate:
- Refer to Interim Study, MA, VV; 05/15/2024; SJ 12
- Special Order to Beginning of Calendar, Without Objection, MA; 05/15/2024; SJ 12
On May 7, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 05/16/2024, Vote 4-0; SC 19
On April 11, 2024 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 04/18/2024, Room 103, SH, 01:40 pm; SC 15
On April 2, 2024 in the Senate:
- Introduced 03/21/2024 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; SJ 8
On March 28, 2024 in the House:
- Lay HB1145 on Table (Rep. Sweeney): MF RC 180-193 03/28/2024 HJ 10 P. 146
- FLAM # 2024-1329h (Reps. Germana, Simon): AA DV 234-125 03/28/2024 HJ 10 P. 148
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-1329h: MA RC 208-162 03/28/2024 HJ 10 P. 148
On March 20, 2024 in the House:
- Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass 03/19/2024 (Vote 11-9; RC) HC 12 P. 29
- Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
On March 13, 2024 in the House:
- Executive Session: 03/19/2024 10:30 am LOB 301-303
On February 21, 2024 in the House:
- Full Committee Work Session: 03/06/2024 10:00 am LOB 301-303
On February 14, 2024 in the House:
- Full Committee Work Session: 02/20/2024 11:00 am LOB 301-303
On February 6, 2024 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 02/14/2024 01:00 pm LOB 301-303
On November 28, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Environment and Agriculture