+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 15, 2024 in the Senate:
- Refer to Interim Study, MA, VV; 05/15/2024; SJ 12
- Special Order to Beginning of Calendar, Without Objection, MA; 05/15/2024; SJ 12
On May 1, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 05/16/2024, Vote 4-0; SC 19
On April 17, 2024 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 04/25/2024, Room 103, SH, 09:30 am; SC 16
On March 13, 2024 in the Senate:
- Introduced 03/07/2024 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; SJ 7
On March 7, 2024 in the House:
- Amendment # 2024-0653h: AA VV 03/07/2024 HJ 7 P. 89
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-0653h: MA VV 03/07/2024 HJ 7 P. 89
On February 20, 2024 in the House:
- Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0653h (NT) 02/14/2024 (Vote 18-2; RC) HC 9 P. 29
- Minority Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study
On February 7, 2024 in the House:
- ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 02/14/2024 09:30 am LOB 305
On January 31, 2024 in the House:
- ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/07/2024 10:00 am LOB 305
On January 17, 2024 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/24/2024 03:00 pm LOB 305
On November 28, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor