+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On January 8, 2020 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA VV 01/08/2020 HJ 1 P. 55
On November 13, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 18-0; CC) HC 50 P. 15
On October 22, 2019 in the House:
- Full Committee Work Session: 11/05/2019 09:30 am LOB 202
On October 2, 2019 in the House:
- Executive Session: 11/12/2019 10:00 am LOB 202
On September 18, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 09/26/2019 09:30 am LOB 202
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Retained in Committee
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Executive Session: 03/13/2019 10:00 am LOB 202
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Full Committee Work Session: 02/21/2019 01:00 pm LOB 202
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Full Committee Work Session: 02/05/2019 02:30 pm LOB 202
- Public Hearing: 02/05/2019 01:00 pm LOB 202
- Vacated and Referred to Ways and Means (): MA VV 01/31/2019 HJ 4 P. 2
On December 26, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs HJ 2 P. 38
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor