+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA VV
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 15-0; CC); HC 13
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- CONTINUED Executive Session: 2/18/2014 1:00 PM LOB 306
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 2/18/2014 11:00 AM LOB 205
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- Executive Session: 1/28/2014 2:15 PM LOB 205=RECESSED=
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 1/23/2014 10:00 AM LOB 205
On January 8, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 1/14/2014 1:00 PM LOB 205
On December 12, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor