+ − Actions (8)
On March 13, 2020 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA VV 03/12/2020 HJ 8 P. 209
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/11/2020 (Vote 16-4; RC) HC 10 P. 77
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- Executive Session: 03/03/2020 01:00 pm LOB 202
- Full Committee Work Session: 02/18/2020 01:00 pm LOB 202
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 02/12/2020 11:00 am LOB 202
On January 14, 2020 in the House:
- ==TIME CHANGE== Public Hearing: 01/28/2020 10:00 am LOB 202
On January 9, 2020 in the House:
- Vacated and Referred to Ways and Means (Rep. Butler): MA VV 01/09/2020 HJ 2 P. 45
On December 2, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs HJ 1 P. 10
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor