+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA VV 03/05/2020 HJ 6 P. 2
On February 20, 2020 in the House:
- Special Order to regular place in next calendar (Rep. Ley): MA VV 02/20/2020
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- Removed from Consent (Rep. Love) 02/19/2020 HJ 4 P. 1
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/19/2020 (Vote 17-3; CC) HC 7 P. 3
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- Full Committee Work Session: 02/05/2020 10:00 am LOB 204
On January 21, 2020 in the House:
- Executive Session: 02/05/2020 01:00 pm LOB 204
- Public Hearing: 02/04/2020 02:00 pm LOB 204
On December 2, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety HJ 1 P. 10
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor