+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On June 20, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor Sununu 06/18/2019; Chapter 74; Eff: 08/17/2019
On June 12, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled 06/06/2019 HJ 18 P. 47
On June 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled (In recess 06/06/2019); SJ 20
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg; 05/23/2019; SJ 17
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/23/2019; Vote 5-0; CC SC 23
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- ==RESCHEDULED== Hearing: 05/16/2019, Room 101, LOB, 09:00 am; SC 21
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- ==CANCELLED== Hearing: 05/15/2019, Room 101, LOB, 09:00 am; SC 20
On April 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced 04/11/2019 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; SJ 13
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA VV 04/04/2019 HJ 12 P. 2
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 04/04/2019 (Vote 17-0; CC) HC 18 P. 3
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Executive Session: 03/20/2019 12:15 pm LOB 306
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 03/06/2019 10:30 am LOB 306
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Executive Departments and Administration 02/14/2019 HJ 5 P. 15
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0059h: MA VV 02/14/2019 HJ 5 P. 13
- Amendment # 2019-0059h: AA VV 02/14/2019 HJ 5 P. 13
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0059h for 02/14/2019 (Vote 20-0; CC) HC 11 P. 7
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- Executive Session: 01/29/2019 01:00 pm LOB 205
- Division I Subcommittee Work Session: 01/29/2019 10:30 am LOB 104
On January 16, 2019 in the House:
- ==CONTINUED== Public Hearing: 01/22/2019 01:00 pm LOB 205
On January 10, 2019 in the House:
- ==RECESSED== Public Hearing: 01/15/2019 11:30 am LOB 303
On December 26, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs HJ 2 P. 38