+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 23, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Governor Hassan 05/19/2016; Chapter 75; Eff. 7/18/2016
On May 12, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled 05/11/2016 HJ 38 P. 46
On May 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled (In recess 05/05/2016); SJ 17
On April 20, 2016 in the House:
- House Concurs with Senate Amendment 1200s (Rep. Ladd): MA VV 04/20/2016 HJ 36 P. 2
On April 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 1200s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; 04/07/2016; SJ 12
- Committee Amendment 1200s, AA, VV; 04/07/2016 SJ 12
On March 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-1200s, 04/07/2016; SC 13
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 03/29/2016, Room 103, LOB, 09:50 am; SC 12
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced 03/17/2016 and Referred to Education; SJ 10
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 0554h: MA VV 03/09/2016 HJ 23 P. 15
- Amendment #2016-0554h: AA VV 03/09/2016 HJ 23 P. 15
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-0554h for 03/09/2016 (Vote 16-1; CC) HC 14 P. 9
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Education HJ 4 P. 3
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Executive Session: 02/16/2016 09:30 AM LOB 207
- ==CONTINUED== Public Hearing: 02/04/2016 11:00 AM LOB 207
- ==RECESSED== Public Hearing: 01/21/2016 09:30 AM LOB207