+ − Actions (7)
On September 23, 2020 in the House:
- Died on Table
On March 13, 2020 in the House:
- Lay on Table (Rep. Ley): MA DV 226-43 03/12/2020 HJ 8 P. 199
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
- Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/11/2020 (Vote 18-2; RC) HC 10 P. 75
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Executive Session: 02/27/2020 10:00 am LOB 203
- Public Hearing: 02/25/2020 10:30 am LOB 203
On December 2, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Transportation HJ 1 P. 10