+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On June 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, MA, VV; 06/16/2020; SJ 8
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-0270h (NT): MA VV 03/05/2020 HJ 6 P. 2
- Amendment # 2020-0270h (NT): AA VV 03/05/2020 HJ 6 P. 2
On February 20, 2020 in the House:
- Special Order to regular place in next calendar (Rep. Ley): MA VV 02/20/2020
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- Removed from Consent (Rep. Spillane) 02/19/2020 HJ 4 P. 1
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0270h (NT) for 02/19/2020 (Vote 19-1; CC) HC 7 P. 3
On January 9, 2020 in the House:
- Executive Session: 01/28/2020 10:00 am LOB 204
- Public Hearing: 01/22/2020 11:00 am LOB 204
On December 2, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety HJ 1 P. 10
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor