+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate MA VV
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Feb 12 (Vote 16-0; CC); HC 9
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- Executive Session: 2/04/2014 1:00 PM LOB 301
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 1/30/2014 11:00 AM LOB 301
On December 12, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Municipal and County Government
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor