+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On July 26, 2024 in the House:
- Signed by Governor Sununu 07/19/2024; Chapter 218; eff.01/01/2025
On July 2, 2024 in the House:
- Enrolled (in recess of) 06/13/2024 HJ 16
On July 2, 2024 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Adopted, VV, (In recess 06/13/2024); SJ 18
On May 31, 2024 in the House:
- House Concurs with Senate Amendment 2024-1726s (Rep. Renzullo): MA VV 05/30/2024 HJ 15 P. 22
On May 15, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment # 2024-1726s, AA, VV; 05/15/2024; SJ 12
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-1726s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; 05/15/2024; SJ 12
- Special Order to Beginning of Calendar, Without Objection, MA; 05/15/2024; SJ 12
On May 1, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2024-1726s, 05/16/2024, Vote 4-0; SC 19
On April 17, 2024 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 04/23/2024, Room 103, SH, 09:30 am; SC 17
On February 22, 2024 in the Senate:
- Introduced 02/21/2024 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; SJ 6
On February 8, 2024 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA VV 02/08/2024 HJ 4 P. 12
On January 30, 2024 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass 01/24/2024 (Vote 20-0; CC)
On January 17, 2024 in the House:
- Executive Session: 01/24/2024 10:00 am LOB 305
On January 9, 2024 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/17/2024 01:00 pm LOB 305
On November 28, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor