+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On July 10, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Governor Sununu 07/02/2018; Chapter 345; I. Sec 1-2 eff 8/31/2018;II. Rem eff 07/02/2018
On June 5, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled 05/23/2018
On June 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled (In recess 05/23/2018); SJ 18
On May 29, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-2095e: AA VV 05/23/2018
On May 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-2095e Adopted, VV, (In recess of 05/23/2018); SJ 18
On May 10, 2018 in the House:
- House Concurs with Senate Amendment 1628s (Reps. Christensen, Barry): MA VV 05/10/2018
On May 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg; 05/03/2018; SJ 16
On May 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/03/2018;
- Special Order to 05/03/2018, Without Objection, MA; 05/02/2018 SJ 15
On April 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/02/2018; SC 19A
On April 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-1628s, MA, VV; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 04/26/2018; SJ 14
- Committee Amendment # 2018-1628s, AA, VV; 04/26/2018; SJ 14
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1628s, 04/26/2018; SC 18
On March 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 04/03/2018, Room 103, SH, 10:15 am; SC 15
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced 03/08/2018 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; SJ 7
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA VV 03/06/2018 HJ 6 P. 102
On February 23, 2018 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/06/2018 (Vote 19-0; RC) HC 9 P. 46
- Executive Session: 02/20/2018 LOB 304
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Full Committee Work Session: 02/20/2018 01:30 PM LOB 304
- Public Hearing: 02/20/2018 10:00 AM LOB 304
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Science, Technology and Energy 02/08/2018 HJ 3 P. 64
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 0334h: MA VV 02/08/2018 HJ 3 P. 64
- Amendment # 2018-0334h: AA VV 02/08/2018 HJ 3 P. 61
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0334h for 02/07/2018 (Vote 20-0; RC) HC 5 P. 25
On January 17, 2018 in the House:
- Full Committee Work Session: 01/24/2018 10:00 AM LOB 305
On January 11, 2018 in the House:
- Executive Session: 01/30/2018 10:00 AM LOB 305
- Public Hearing: 01/23/2018 01:45 PM LOB 305
On November 16, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development HJ 1 P. 2