+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On October 10, 2024 in the House:
- Died on Table, Session ended 10/10/2024 HJ 17
On March 7, 2024 in the House:
- Lay HB1100 on Table (Rep. Spillane): MA DV 240-123 03/07/2024 HJ 7 P. 51
On February 9, 2024 in the House:
- Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate 02/06/2024 (Vote 14-5; RC) HC 9 P. 20
- Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
On January 5, 2024 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 02/06/2024 01:30 pm LOB 307
- Executive Session: 02/06/2024 02:30 pm LOB 307
On November 28, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Fish and Game and Marine Resources