+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (20)
On August 7, 2024 in the House:
- Signed by Governor Sununu 08/02/2024; Chapter 327; Eff. 07/01/2024 HJ 16
On July 23, 2024 in the House:
- Enrolled (in recess of) 06/13/2024 HJ 16 P. 56
- Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2024-2340e: AA VV (in recess of) 06/13/2024 HJ 16 P. 48
On July 18, 2024 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Adopted, VV, (In recess 06/13/2024); SJ 18
On July 10, 2024 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2024-2340e Adopted, VV, (In recess of 06/13/2024); SJ 18
On May 30, 2024 in the House:
- House Concurs with Senate Amendment 2024-1738s (Rep. C. McGuire): MA VV 05/30/2024 HJ 15 P. 15
On May 9, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment # 2024-1738s, AA, VV; 05/15/2024; SJ 12
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-1738s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; 05/15/2024; SJ 12
On May 7, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2024-1738s, 05/16/2024; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 19
On April 3, 2024 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 04/10/2024, Room 103, SH, 09:30 am; SC 14
On April 2, 2024 in the Senate:
- Introduced 03/21/2024 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; SJ 8
On March 28, 2024 in the House:
- Amendment # 2024-1212h (NT): AA VV 03/28/2024 HJ 10 P. 31
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-1212h: MA VV 03/28/2024 HJ 10 P. 31
On March 20, 2024 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-1212h (NT) 03/20/2024 (Vote 20-0; CC) HC 12 P. 14
On March 14, 2024 in the House:
- Executive Session: 03/20/2024 10:30 am LOB 306-308
On March 6, 2024 in the House:
- Executive Session: 03/13/2024 10:00 am LOB 306-308
On February 27, 2024 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 03/06/2024 09:30 am LOB 306-308
On February 6, 2024 in the House:
- Public Hearing on non-germane Amendment # 2024-0031h: 02/14/2024 02:30 pm LOB 306-308
- Public Hearing: 02/13/2024 02:00 pm LOB 305
On November 28, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor