+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On July 22, 2024 in the House:
- Signed by Governor Sununu 07/12/2024; Chapter 184; eff. 09/10/2024
On June 27, 2024 in the House:
- Enrolled (in recess of) 06/13/2024 HJ 16
On June 27, 2024 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Adopted, VV, (In recess 06/13/2024); SJ 18
On May 23, 2024 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg; 05/23/2024; SJ 14
On May 22, 2024 in the Senate:
- Special Order to 05/23/2024, Without Objection, MA; 05/22/2024 SJ 14
On May 21, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/22/2024, Vote 7-0; SC 20A
On May 15, 2024 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 05/15/2024; SJ 12
- Special Order to Beginning of Calendar, Without Objection, MA; 05/15/2024; SJ 12
On May 7, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/16/2024, Vote 4-0; SC 19
On April 9, 2024 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 04/16/2024, Room 100, SH, 10:00 am; SC 15
On April 2, 2024 in the Senate:
- Introduced 03/21/2024 and Referred to Commerce; SJ 8
On March 28, 2024 in the House:
- Amendment # 2024-0950h (NT): AA VV 03/28/2024 HJ 10 P. 4
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-0950h: MA VV 03/28/2024 HJ 10 P. 4
On March 18, 2024 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0950h (NT) 03/13/2024 (Vote 18-0; CC) HC 12 P. 4
On March 7, 2024 in the House:
- Executive Session: 03/13/2024 10:00 am LOB 302-304
On February 21, 2024 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 03/06/2024 10:30 am LOB 302-304
On February 14, 2024 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 02/21/2024 10:00 am LOB 302-304
On February 12, 2024 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/11/2024 10:15 am LOB 302-304
On February 7, 2024 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 02/13/2024 01:00 pm LOB 306-308
On November 28, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor