+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On July 22, 2024 in the House:
- Signed by Governor Sununu 07/03/2024; Chapter 103; eff. 07/01/2024
On June 25, 2024 in the House:
- Enrolled (in recess of) 06/13/2024 HJ 16 P. 45
On June 24, 2024 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Adopted, VV, (In recess 06/13/2024); SJ 18
On May 9, 2024 in the House:
- House Concurs with Senate Amendment 2024-1618s (Rep. Renzullo): MA VV 05/09/2024 HJ 13 P. 2
On April 26, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment # 2024-1618s, AA, VV; 05/02/2024; SJ 11
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-1618s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; 05/02/2024; SJ 11
On April 24, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2024-1618s, 05/02/2024; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 17
On April 17, 2024 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 04/23/2024, Room 103, SH, 09:10 am; SC 17
On February 22, 2024 in the Senate:
- Introduced 02/21/2024 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; SJ 6
On February 1, 2024 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA VV 02/01/2024 HJ 3 P. 10
On January 18, 2024 in the House:
- Executive Session: 01/17/2024 11:00 am LOB 305
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass 01/17/2024 (Vote 16-0; CC) HC 4 P. 9
On January 9, 2024 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/17/2024 11:00 am LOB 305
On November 27, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development