+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On April 26, 2024 in the Senate:
- Refer to Interim Study, MA, VV; 05/02/2024; SJ 11
On April 24, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 05/02/2024; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 17
On March 26, 2024 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 04/02/2024, Room 100, SH, 10:10 am; SC 13
On February 22, 2024 in the Senate:
- Introduced 02/21/2024 and Referred to Commerce; SJ 6
On February 1, 2024 in the House:
- Amendment # 2024-0099h (NT): AA VV 02/01/2024 HJ 3 P. 10
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-0099h: MA VV 02/01/2024 HJ 3 P. 10
On January 17, 2024 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0099h (NT) 01/09/2024 (Vote 19-0; CC) HC 4 P. 9
On January 3, 2024 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/08/2024 09:15 am LOB 302-304
- Executive Session: 01/09/2024 02:00 pm LOB 302-304
- Full Committee Work Session: 01/09/2024 10:00 am LOB 302-304
On November 27, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor