+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA VV 02/27/2019 HJ 6 P. 18
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/27/2019 (Vote 19-0; CC) HC 13 P. 11
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Executive Session: 02/12/2019 10:00 am LOB 208
On January 17, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 01/23/2019 01:00 pm LOB 104
On January 9, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 01/17/2019 10:00 am LOB 208
On January 3, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/09/2019 10:00 am LOB208
On December 26, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Judiciary HJ 2 P. 37