+ − Actions (6)
On January 9, 2020 in the House:
- Died on Table
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Lay on Table (Rep. Cali-Pitts): MA RC 232-109 02/28/2019 HJ 7 P. 52
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/27/2019 (Vote 14-5; RC) HC 13 P. 28
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Executive Session: 02/19/2019 10:00 am LOB 207
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 02/13/2019 09:00 am LOB 210-211
On December 26, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Education HJ 2 P. 37
+ − Vote
February 28, 2019: Table
- Yeas: 232
- Nays: 109
- Present/NV: 8
- Absent: 51
+ − Sponsors (7)
Type:
Primary Sponsor