+ − Actions (15)
On July 26, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Governor Sununu 07/23/2021; Chapter 128; Eff: 09/21/2021
On July 12, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled (in recess of) 06/24/2021
On July 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Adopted, VV, (In recess 06/24/2021); SJ 20
On June 10, 2021 in the House:
- House Concurs with Senate Amendment 2021-1130s (Rep. Walsh): MA VV 06/10/2021 HJ 10 P. 19
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2021-1130s, RC 23Y-1N, MA; OT3rdg; 04/22/2021; SJ 12
- Committee Amendment # 2021-1130s, RC 23Y-1N, AA; 04/22/2021; SJ 12
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-1130s, 04/22/2021; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 20
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Remote Hearing: 04/13/2021, 01:00 pm; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; SC 19
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced 04/01/2021 and Referred to Transportation; SJ 11
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Reconsider (Rep. Osborne): MF VV 04/07/2021 HJ 5 P. 50
- Ought to Pass: MA VV 04/07/2021 HJ 5 P. 47
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 19-0; CC) HC 18 P. 24
On March 5, 2021 in the House:
- Executive Session: 03/05/2021 11:30 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/99182085994
On February 19, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 02/19/2021 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/98257633759 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
On January 4, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Transportation HJ 2 P. 35