+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (37)
On November 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Inexpedient to Legislate, RC 13Y-11N, MA
On November 21, 2013 in the House:
- Floor Amendment #2013-2415h (Rep. C.McGuire) Failed, RC 146-195;
- Challenge The Ruling Of The Chair (Rep. W.O'Brien) Adopted, RC 209-139
- Challenge The Ruling Of The Chair (Rep. W.O'Brien) Adopted, RC 215-137;
- Challenge The Ruling Of The Chair On Division (Rep. W.O'Brien) Adopted, RC 219-133;
- Challenge The Ruling Of The Chair On Out Of Order (Rep. W.O'Brien) Adopted, RC 215-137;
- To Postpone Motion Indefinitely (Rep. Vaillancourt) Failed, RC 159-195;
- Motion To Adjourn (Rep. Hikel) Failed, RC 144-211;
- Motion To Print Debate (Rep. Jones) Failed, RC 115-240;
- Amendment #2013-2418h : AA RC 204-151;
- Motion to Divide Section 8 (Rep. W.O'Brien) Failed, RC 156-197;
- Motion To Divide Section 10 (Rep. O'Brien) Failed, RC 154-200;
- Motion To Divide Section 13 Of FLAM: #2013-2434h (Rep. Hoell) Failed, RC 142-208;
On November 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sen. Sanborn Moved Inexpedient to Legislate
On November 21, 2013 in the House:
- Floor Amendment #2013-2419h (Rep. D.McGuire) Failed, 154-197;
- Floor Amendment #2013-2434h (Rep. Kurk) Failed, RC 162-191;
- Floor Amendment #2013-2420h (Rep. D.McGuire) Failed, RC 142-200;
On November 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sen. Bradley Moved Introduction of SSHB1, MA, VV; Special Session
- Ought to Pass, RC 11Y-13N, MF
- Sen. Carson Moved Reconsideration on Ought to Pass, MA VV
- Ought to Pass, RC 10Y-13N, MF
On November 21, 2013 in the House:
- Floor Amendment #2013-2430h (Rep. Steven Smith) Failed, DIV 157-184
On November 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Without Objection Dispense Referral To Committee
- Sen. Larsen Moved Ought to Pass
On November 21, 2013 in the House:
- Ought To Pass As Amended: MA, RC 198-146;
- Motion To Lay On Table (Rep. Notter) Failed, RC 139-203;
- Shall Debate Be Limited To Ten Minutes Per Side, RC 232-112;
- Shall The Body Allow Questions In A Ten Minute Debate Per Side, DIV 84-259;
- Shall Debate Be Limited To 20 Minutes Per Side (Rep. Vaillancourt) Failed, DIV 82-261;
- Shall Debate Be Limited To 30 Minutes Per Side (Rep. Vaillancourt) Failed, DIV 83-260;
On November 15, 2013 in the House:
- Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
- Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-2418h for Nov 21 (Vote 15-10; RC)
On November 13, 2013 in the House:
- Executive Session: 11/14/2013 1:00 PM LOB 210-211
- ==Continued Full Committee Work Session: 11/14/2013 10:30 AM LOB 210-211
On November 7, 2013 in the House:
- Full Committee Work Session: 11/13/2013 10:00 AM LOB 210-211 ==Recessed==
- Public Hearing: 11/12/2013 10:00 am, Representatives Hall, State House, 107 North Main St, Concord
- Introduced: MA RC 183-141 and Referred to Finance
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Votes (19)
November 21, 2013: Inexpedient to Legislate
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 11
November 21, 2013: CHALLENGE THE RULING OF THE CHAIR (REP WILLIAM OBRIEN)
- Yeas: 209
- Nays: 139
November 21, 2013: CHALLENGE THE RULING OF THE CHAIR (REP W. OBRIEN)
- Yeas: 215
- Nays: 137
November 21, 2013: CHALLENGE THE RULING OF THE CHAIR ON DIVISION (W.OBRIEN)
- Yeas: 219
- Nays: 133
November 21, 2013: CHALLENGE RULING OF CHAIR ON OUT OF ORDER (REP. W OBRIEN)
- Yeas: 215
- Nays: 137
November 21, 2013: TO POSTPONE MOTION INDEFINITELY (REP VAILLANCOURT)
- Yeas: 159
- Nays: 195
November 21, 2013: MAJ AM: 2418H
- Yeas: 204
- Nays: 151
November 21, 2013: MOTION TO DIVIDE SECTION 8 (REP WILLIAM OBRIEN)
- Yeas: 156
- Nays: 197
November 21, 2013: MOTION TO DIVIDE SECTION 10 (REP W. O'BRIEN)
- Yeas: 154
- Nays: 200
November 21, 2013: MOTION TO DIVIDE SETION 13 OF FLAM:2434H (REP HOELL)
- Yeas: 142
- Nays: 208
November 21, 2013: FLAM: 2434H (REP KURK)
- Yeas: 162
- Nays: 191
November 21, 2013: FLAM: 2419H (REP D. McGUIRE)
- Yeas: 154
- Nays: 197
November 21, 2013: FLAM: 2415H (REP. C.McGUIRE)
- Yeas: 146
- Nays: 195
November 21, 2013: FLAM: 2420H (REP D.McGUIRE)
- Yeas: 142
- Nays: 200
November 21, 2013: MOTION TO LAY ON THE TABLE (REP. NOTTER)
- Yeas: 139
- Nays: 203
November 21, 2013: OUGHT TO PASS AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 198
- Nays: 146
November 21, 2013: Ought to Pass
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 13
November 21, 2013: Reconsideration of Vote
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 13
November 7, 2013: DRAFTING, INTRO, READ & REFERRAL TO COMM (REP SHURTLEFF)
- Yeas: 183
- Nays: 141