+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On June 8, 2023 in the House:
- Lay on Table (Rep. S. Smith): MA VV 06/08/2023 HJ 15 P. 65
On June 6, 2023 in the House:
- Removed from Consent (Reps. Filiault, S. Smith, Read, Germana, Newell, Aron, Harley, Sellers, Spillane, Doucette) 06/06/2023 HJ 15 P. 2
On May 31, 2023 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate 05/30/2023 (Vote 19-0; C)
On May 23, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 05/30/2023 09:45 am LOB 306-308
On April 27, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 05/09/2023 09:45 am LOB 306-308
On April 7, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 04/06/2023 and referred to Election Law
On March 30, 2023 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass, RC 23Y-0N, MA, by Necessary 3/5; OT3rdg; 03/30/2023 SJ 12
On March 21, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/30/2023; SC 15
On February 16, 2023 in the Senate:
- ==TIME CHANGE== Hearing: 03/07/2023, Room 103, LOB, 09:30 am; SC 12
On January 19, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/19/2023 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; SJ 5
+ − Vote
March 30, 2023: Ought to Pass
- Yeas: 23
- Present/NV: 23
- Absent: 1
Details:
+
−
- Jeb Bradley: Yea
- David Watters: Yea
- Sharon Carson: Yea
- Donna Soucy: Yea
- Lou D'Allesandro: Yea
- Regina Birdsell: Yea
- Shannon Chandley: Yea
- James Gray: Yea
- Keith Murphy: Yea
- Cindy Rosenwald: Yea
- Kevin Avard: Yea
- Ruth Ward: Yea
- Daniel Innis: Yea
- Debra Altschiller: Yea
- Donovan Fenton: Yea
- Timothy Lang: Yea
- Howard Pearl: Yea
- Daryl Abbas: Yea
- Suzanne Prentiss: Yea
- Rebecca Whitley: Yea
- Bill Gannon: Excused
- Rebecca Perkins Kwoka: Yea
- Denise Ricciardi: Yea
- Carrie Gendreau: Yea
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor