+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA DV 282-74 03/20/2019 HJ 11 P. 14
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
- Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/19/2019 (Vote 12-6; RC) HC 16 P. 29
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Executive Session: 03/13/2019 10:00 am LOB 301
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 03/06/2019 02:40 pm LOB 301-303
On December 31, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Municipal and County Government HJ 2 P. 47
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor