+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 22, 2023 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA VV 03/22/2023 HJ 10 P. 16
On March 14, 2023 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate CACR8 03/13/2023 (Vote 20-0; CC) HC 16 P. 10
On March 1, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 03/08/2023 11:00 am LOB 201-203
On February 8, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 03/01/2023 02:00 pm LOB 210-211
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs HJ 3 P. 15
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor