+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (3)
On March 1, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 03/08/2023 09:30 am LOB 205-207
On February 16, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 02/24/2023 09:30 am LOB 205-207
On January 3, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced 01/04/2023 and referred to Education
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor