+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 30, 2023 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass, RC 22Y-1N, MA, by Necessary 3/5; OT3rdg; 03/30/2023 SJ 12
On March 21, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/30/2023; SC 15
On March 15, 2023 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 03/21/2023, Room 100, SH, 01:00 pm; SC 14
On March 7, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced 02/22/2023 and Referred to Judiciary; SJ 9
On February 23, 2023 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA RC 321-27 By Necessary Three-Fifths Vote 02/23/2023 HJ 7 P. 8
On February 8, 2023 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass 01/30/2023 (Vote 18-2; RC) HC 12 P. 21
On January 24, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 01/30/2023 01:00 pm LOB 206-208
On January 11, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/18/2023 02:30 pm LOB 206-208
On December 28, 2022 in the House:
- Introduced 01/04/2023 and referred to Judiciary
+ − Votes (2)
March 30, 2023: Ought to Pass
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 23
- Absent: 1
February 23, 2023: OTP
- Yeas: 321
- Nays: 27
- Present/NV: 20
- Absent: 29
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor