+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On February 14, 2023 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA VV 02/14/2023 HJ 5
On February 9, 2023 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate CACR 5 01/30/2023 (Vote 19-0; CC) HC 11 P. 8
On January 24, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 01/30/2023 01:00 pm LOB 206-208
On January 11, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/18/2023 01:30 pm LOB 206-208
On December 28, 2022 in the House:
- Introduced 01/04/2023 and referred to Judiciary
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor