+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On October 10, 2024 in the House:
- Died, Session ended 10/10/2024 HJ 17
On February 1, 2024 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MF RC 193-184 Lacking Necessary Three-Fifths Vote 02/01/2024 HJ 3 P. 20
On January 24, 2024 in the House:
- Committee Report: Without Recommendation 01/18/2024 (Vote 10-10; RC) HC 4 P. 14
On January 9, 2024 in the House:
- Executive Session: 01/18/2024 09:00 am LOB 206-208
On January 5, 2024 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 01/10/2024 10:00 am SH Reps Hall
On December 15, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Judiciary HJ 1 P. 32
+ − Vote
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor