+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On February 22, 2024 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA VV 02/22/2024 HJ 6 P. 11
On February 14, 2024 in the House:
- Executive Session: 02/13/2024 02:30 pm LOB 305
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate 02/13/2024 (Vote 13-1; CC)
On February 6, 2024 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 02/13/2024 02:30 pm LOB 305
On December 11, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration HJ 1 P. 32